Wednesday, October 30, 2013
Monday, October 28, 2013
The first 11 Times Rule:
This is for the numbers 1-9
When multiplying any single digit number by 11 you just write that number twice.
Multiply 11 by 3 to get 33, multiply 11 by 4 to get 44. Each number to 10 is just duplicated.
The second 11 Times Rule:
This is for any two digit number
You are going to take the two digits of your number add them together, and put the sum in between the two digits you started with.
For example: if you take 11 x 18. Jot down 1 and 8 with a space between it. 1 8.
The sum of 1+8=9, do put the 9 in between the 1 and 8.
so you get 198.
12 x 11 1 2 1+2=3 132 12 x 11=132
15 x 11 1 5 1+5=6 165 15 x 11=16511's
Education With Wes
Friday, October 25, 2013
- Hold your hands in front of you with your fingers spread out, your palm toward you.
- For whichever number you are multiplying by 9, count over that many fingers. For 9 X 3 count from the left and bend your third finger (your left middle finger) down. 9 X 4 would be the fourth finger (left hand ring finger), 9 X 7 would be the 7th finger (ring finger on your right hand) etc.)
- Now count the fingers that are up before the finger you bent over, that's your tens place, and the fingers up on the right side of your finger bent over is in the ones place. For 3 X 9 you have 2 fingers in front of the bent finger and 7 after the bent finger. (7 X 9, you have 6 fingers in front of the bent finger and 3 after the bent finger.)
- Thus the answer must be 27. (Answer, 63)
Education With Wes
Tuesday, October 22, 2013
So you want to have your students practice their times tables but need a way to do it? Here is 7 different ways to practice. Someone who is just starting out may need 6-8 minutes or more. But someone who is getting good should be pushing 5 mins. Get your free math worksheets here.